Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 19 Online
» 609 Today
» 1287 Yesterday
» 1896 Week
» 31482 Month
» 405495 Year
» 1627060 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1359
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 1685   07/1918
O4 5382   23/02/1929
O4 6502   07/11/1931
O4 6557   27/10/1934
O4 6244   01/05/1937