Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 24 Online
» 925 Today
» 1034 Yesterday
» 1959 Week
» 24465 Month
» 327655 Year
» 1549220 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1954
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 1249   04/08/1923
O4 6364   28/01/1928
O4 6270   18/06/1932
O4 5388   05/09/1936
O4 6244   05/08/1939