Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 174 Today
» 1348 Yesterday
» 174 Week
» 39220 Month
» 413233 Year
» 1634798 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #28386
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 100A
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O1 63591   29/11/1952
O1 63784   20/11/1954
O1 63740   16/03/1957
O4 63754   22/04/1960