Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 1239 Today
» 1371 Yesterday
» 5199 Week
» 34785 Month
» 408798 Year
» 1630363 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1945
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 1242   11/02/1922
O4 6298   13/10/1928
O4 6606   03/09/1930
O4 6578   29/04/1933
O4 6575   20/07/1935
O4 6245   02/10/1937
O4 5397   17/02/1940