Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 22 Online
» 517 Today
» 1099 Yesterday
» 1616 Week
» 7750 Month
» 235634 Year
» 1457199 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #872
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 6242   12/05/1928
O4 6509   01/03/1930
O4 6592   15/07/1932
O4 6247   20/04/1935
O4 5394   10/04/1937
O4 6528   20/05/1939
O4 63765   12/08/1950