Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 1093 Today
» 1226 Yesterday
» 2319 Week
» 21964 Month
» 56606 Year
» 1278171 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1886
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 5386   13/12/1928
O4 6331   02/05/1931
O4 5381   02/09/1933
O4 6248   31/12/1935
O4 6311   23/04/1938