Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 1094 Today
» 1226 Yesterday
» 2320 Week
» 21965 Month
» 56607 Year
» 1278172 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1940
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 1249   22/10/1921
O4 376   18/08/1923
O4 6520   06/07/1935
O4 6350   09/10/1937
O4 6559   29/06/1940
O4 6620   22/05/1943