Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 1092 Today
» 1226 Yesterday
» 2318 Week
» 21963 Month
» 56605 Year
» 1278170 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #28358
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 100A
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O1 63596   10/11/1951
O1 63619   20/02/1954
O1 63817   09/02/1957
O4 63688   06/03/1962