Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 22 Online
» 1078 Today
» 1091 Yesterday
» 8532 Week
» 11114 Month
» 275747 Year
» 1497312 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #3345
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 5377   08/10/1938
O4 6534   15/02/1941
O4 6255   20/11/1943
O4 3787   21/09/1946
O4 63696   19/03/1949