Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 23 Online
» 681 Today
» 1408 Yesterday
» 3326 Week
» 5908 Month
» 270541 Year
» 1492106 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #3201
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 6268   20/07/1935
O4 6349   03/12/1938
O4 5379   04/01/1941
O4 6366   07/08/1943
O4 3783   14/09/1946
O4 3756   31/12/1948