Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 145 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 14188 Week
» 79142 Month
» 281806 Year
» 3308659 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Boiler #3319
Pre Grouping Company |
GCR |
Big Four Company |
LNER |
Diagram |
15 |
Firebox Type |
Belpaire |
|
Boiler History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
O4 |
6309 |
|
12/03/1938 |
O4 |
5385 |
|
08/06/1940 |
O4 |
6578 |
|
10/10/1942 |
O4 |
6611 |
|
18/11/1944 |
O4 |
63665 |
|
28/01/1950 |
|