Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 25 Online
» 622 Today
» 1251 Yesterday
» 4360 Week
» 1873 Month
» 229757 Year
» 1451322 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1281
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 6291   09/07/1935
O4 6280   13/11/1937
O4 6262   24/05/1941
O4 5011   23/10/1943
O4 5386   10/11/1945
O4 63822   17/04/1948