Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 68 Today
» 1253 Yesterday
» 7528 Week
» 5041 Month
» 232925 Year
» 1454490 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1052
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 1687   11/1918
O4 6285   25/03/1930
O4 6525   13/02/1932
O4 5395   29/05/1937
O4 6345   26/08/1939