Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 24 Online
» 457 Today
» 1099 Yesterday
» 1556 Week
» 7690 Month
» 235574 Year
» 1457139 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #3337
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 6637   23/07/1938
O4 6523   18/01/1941
O4 6579   04/12/1943
O4 3681   31/08/1946
O4 63622   02/10/1948