Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 25 Online
» 347 Today
» 862 Yesterday
» 3895 Week
» 4785 Month
» 312766 Year
» 1197147 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #3217
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 5017   09/11/1935
O4 6347   17/12/1938
O4 6526   29/03/1941
O4 6614   08/01/1944
O4 3873   18/01/1947
O4 3735   24/12/1948