Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 304 Today
» 1270 Yesterday
» 6667 Week
» 9249 Month
» 273882 Year
» 1495447 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #3205
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 6563   17/08/1935
O4 6272   19/08/1937
O4 6273   11/11/1939
O4 6548   25/04/1942
O4 6639   12/08/1944
O4 3771   07/09/1946
O4 63774   15/01/1949