Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 26 Online
» 523 Today
» 1099 Yesterday
» 1622 Week
» 7756 Month
» 235640 Year
» 1457205 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1021
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 6317   18/04/1931
O4 6601   22/07/1933
O4 6295   07/12/1935
O4 6304   31/08/1938
O4 6566   13/07/1940
O4 6269   27/03/1943
O4 6343   13/01/1945