Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 141 Today
» 1034 Yesterday
» 1175 Week
» 23681 Month
» 326871 Year
» 1548436 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #3351
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 6531   12/11/1938
O4 6567   01/02/1941
O4 6615   01/05/1943
O4 6581   09/03/1946
O4 63855   04/09/1948