Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 1013 Today
» 1245 Yesterday
» 7157 Week
» 38946 Month
» 187711 Year
» 1409276 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #3224
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 6572   14/12/1935
O4 6519   18/06/1938
O4 6256   05/10/1940
O4 6567   17/04/1943
O4 63637   30/07/1949