Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 314 Today
» 1245 Yesterday
» 6458 Week
» 38247 Month
» 187012 Year
» 1408577 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #3355
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 6568   19/11/1938
O4 6620   10/05/1941
O4 6363   29/05/1943
O4 6256   16/03/1946
O4 63914   02/04/1949