Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 23 Online
» 619 Today
» 1260 Yesterday
» 4218 Week
» 10352 Month
» 238236 Year
» 1459801 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #3256
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 6522   07/08/1936
O4 6292   16/07/1938
O4 6284   21/09/1940
O4 5412   30/01/1943
O4 3763   25/05/1946
O4 63787   12/02/1949