Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 206 Today
» 1075 Yesterday
» 6918 Week
» 20022 Month
» 20022 Year
» 1241587 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #28828
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 100A
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O1 63630   19/04/1952
O1 63670   29/05/1954
O1 63746   06/10/1956
O1 63879   24/01/1959