Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 25 Online
» 930 Today
» 1034 Yesterday
» 1964 Week
» 24470 Month
» 327660 Year
» 1549225 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1864
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 6531   14/12/1929
O4 6572   05/12/1931
O4 6549   03/03/1934
O4 6614   02/11/1935
O4 6552   16/07/1938
O4 6263   02/11/1940