Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 20 Online
» 670 Today
» 1408 Yesterday
» 3315 Week
» 5897 Month
» 270530 Year
» 1492095 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #3392
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 6354   13/04/1940
O4 6522   22/08/1942
O4 6574   28/10/1944
O4 3864   09/11/1946
O4 63897   20/08/1949