Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 432 Today
» 1031 Yesterday
» 7439 Week
» 13573 Month
» 241457 Year
» 1463022 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #28329
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 100A
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O1 63752   30/06/1951
O1 63768   13/12/1952
O1 63872   04/12/1954
O1 63752   28/02/1957