Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 27 Online
» 536 Today
» 1251 Yesterday
» 4274 Week
» 1787 Month
» 229671 Year
» 1451236 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #3263
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 6271   22/10/1936
O4 6513   17/12/1938
O4 6576   12/04/1941
O4 6532   18/08/1945
O4 3714   16/08/1947
O4 63764   09/08/1950