Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 3 Online
» 349 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18152 Week
» 71168 Month
» 190695 Year
» 3217548 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Boiler #7606/C1788
Pre Grouping Company |
GNR |
Big Four Company |
LNER |
Diagram |
3 |
|
Boiler History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
K2 |
1685 |
|
06/1921 |
K2 |
4650 |
|
06/01/1928 |
K2 |
4674 |
|
21/11/1931 |
K2 |
4700 |
LOCH LOMOND |
25/07/1942 |
K2 |
61767 |
|
12/06/1948 |
|