Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 73 Today
» 1034 Yesterday
» 1107 Week
» 23613 Month
» 326803 Year
» 1548368 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #3328
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 6356   30/04/1938
O4 6638   13/07/1940
O4 6281   27/11/1942
O4 6311   04/11/1944
O4 3812   22/03/1947
O4 63729   12/03/1949