Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 255 Today
» 1226 Yesterday
» 1481 Week
» 21126 Month
» 55768 Year
» 1277333 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1377
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 1606   02/1918
O4 6351   01/12/1932
O4 6550   11/05/1935
O4 6286   24/04/1937
O4 6620   27/05/1939