Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 148 Today
» 1034 Yesterday
» 1182 Week
» 23688 Month
» 326878 Year
» 1548443 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #28372
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 100A
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O1 63650   23/02/1952
O1 63901   03/02/1954
O4 63791   06/10/1956
O4 63675   19/05/1961