Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 115 Today
» 1053 Yesterday
» 5336 Week
» 20450 Month
» 323640 Year
» 1545205 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #3240
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 6523   30/05/1936
O4 6533   17/09/1938
O4 6360   19/10/1940
O4 6550   11/09/1943
O4 3629   02/08/1947
O4 3679   24/06/1950