Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 339 Today
» 1103 Yesterday
» 5976 Week
» 19080 Month
» 19080 Year
» 1240645 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1276
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 1738   10/1919
O4 6516   04/03/1933
O4 6346   13/07/1935
O4 6357   12/06/1937
O4 6511   25/11/1939