Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 1110 Today
» 1091 Yesterday
» 8564 Week
» 11146 Month
» 275779 Year
» 1497344 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1328
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 1608   03/1918
O4 6324   17/01/1925
O4 6506   14/02/1931
O4 6257   04/11/1933
O4 5001   18/03/1936