Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 881 Today
» 1178 Yesterday
» 4204 Week
» 18461 Month
» 246345 Year
» 1467910 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1353
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 1696   02/1919
O4 6273   09/08/1924
O4 6343   23/07/1929
O4 6641   07/11/1931
O4 6512   06/07/1935
O4 6503   20/11/1937
O4 6304   06/07/1940