Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 344 Today
» 1031 Yesterday
» 7351 Week
» 13485 Month
» 241369 Year
» 1462934 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1131
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 1741   11/1919
O4 6257   13/06/1924
O4 6538   02/04/1932
O4 6267   06/10/1934
O4 6282   26/10/1940
O4 6343   12/06/1943
O4 6496   19/01/1946
O4 63636   28/07/1948