Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 20 Online
» 489 Today
» 1251 Yesterday
» 4227 Week
» 1740 Month
» 229624 Year
» 1451189 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1174
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 6271   31/12/1932
O4 6367   08/12/1934
O4 6634   21/08/1937
O4 6607   21/10/1939
O4 790   25/10/1941