Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 178 Today
» 977 Yesterday
» 4174 Week
» 11358 Month
» 319339 Year
» 1203720 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #28321
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 100A
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 63651   02/06/1951
O4 63785   29/08/1953
O4 63645   01/09/1956
O1 63856   01/02/1960