Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 1278 Today
» 1272 Yesterday
» 7667 Week
» 28109 Month
» 364955 Year
» 1586520 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1002
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 2078   08/1919
O4 6498   22/10/1932
O4 6588   22/02/1936
O4 6283   18/06/1938
O4 6545   04/01/1941
O4 6256   27/03/1943