Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 465 Today
» 1099 Yesterday
» 1564 Week
» 7698 Month
» 235582 Year
» 1457147 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1726
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15B
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O5 415   05/1918
O5 420   13/10/1923
O5 5011   15/10/1927
O5 5015   30/07/1932
B6 5416   06/07/1935
O5 5420   22/10/1938
B6 5416   31/03/1945