Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 145 Today
» 1034 Yesterday
» 1179 Week
» 23685 Month
» 326875 Year
» 1548440 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #13
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15B
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O5 22   02/1921
O5 14   09/06/1923
O5 5419   15/02/1929
O5 5010   21/02/1931
O5 5417   31/05/1934