Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 153 Today
» 1034 Yesterday
» 1187 Week
» 23693 Month
» 326883 Year
» 1548448 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1259
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 6496   02/05/1935
O4 6623   23/01/1937
O4 5419   20/05/1939
O4 6635   09/08/1941
O4 6631   27/05/1944
O4 3807   15/10/1947