Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 25 Online
» 528 Today
» 1251 Yesterday
» 4266 Week
» 1779 Month
» 229663 Year
» 1451228 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #28310
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 100A
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 63893   14/04/1951
O1 63792   01/08/1953
O1 63760   08/03/1956
O4 63728   11/10/1958