Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 869 Today
» 852 Yesterday
» 6678 Week
» 13862 Month
» 321843 Year
» 1206224 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #868
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 2062   06/1919
O4 6584   31/12/1930
O4 6634   18/11/1933
O4 6311   24/10/1935
O4 6524   06/1938
O4 5001   14/09/1940
O4 6561   26/06/1943