Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 1023 Today
» 1075 Yesterday
» 3122 Week
» 14693 Month
» 262986 Year
» 1147367 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1365
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 1868   04/1918
O4 1747   12/1919
O4 6304   07/08/1930
O4 6626   25/06/1932
O4 6636   11/08/1934
O4 6631   11/03/1940