Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 161 Today
» 1034 Yesterday
» 1195 Week
» 23701 Month
» 326891 Year
» 1548456 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #622/22343
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15A
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 6242   01/10/1932
O4 6232   15/05/1937
O4 6207   13/04/1940
O4 6242   20/11/1943
O4 3745   30/08/1947
O4 63851   29/07/1950