Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 1125 Today
» 1091 Yesterday
» 8579 Week
» 11161 Month
» 275794 Year
» 1497359 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #5039/28307
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 100A
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O1 6555   30/06/1945
O1 3803   13/06/1947
O1 63868   26/11/1949
B1 61155   18/04/1953
O4 63850   22/10/1955
O4 63624   10/01/1959