Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 19 Online
» 1244 Today
» 1371 Yesterday
» 5204 Week
» 34790 Month
» 408803 Year
» 1630368 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #3652/22344
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15A
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 6500   02/09/1939
O4 6592   27/05/1944
O4 3589   21/12/1946
O4 63788   02/04/1949