Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 20 Online
» 1071 Today
» 1053 Yesterday
» 6292 Week
» 21406 Month
» 324596 Year
» 1546161 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #3241
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 6282   30/05/1936
O4 6254   23/07/1938
O4 6641   07/06/1941
O4 6342   21/08/1943
O4 6617   23/03/1946