Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 4243 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17649 Week
» 70665 Month
» 190192 Year
» 3217045 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Boiler #29807
Big Four Company |
LNER |
Diagram |
118 |
Firebox Type |
Belpaire |
|
Boiler History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
A1 |
60149 |
|
20/10/1950 |
A1 |
60161 |
NORTH BRITISH |
06/11/1952 |
A2 |
60501 |
COCK O' THE NORTH |
28/09/1954 |
A2 |
60530 |
SAYAJIRAO |
09/02/1957 |
A2 |
60501 |
COCK O' THE NORTH |
23/10/1958 |
A1 |
60145 |
SAINT MUNGO |
23/12/1960 |
A1 |
60124 |
KENILWORTH |
13/05/1964 |
|