Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 65 Today
» 1352 Yesterday
» 7806 Week
» 28248 Month
» 365094 Year
» 1586659 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #3125/29527
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 109
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
V2 4875   03/04/1940
V2 4779   29/04/1942
V2 3670   24/06/1944
V2 4895   02/03/1946
V2 60835 THE GREEN HOWARD 31/07/1948
V2 60864   17/08/1950
V2 60960   19/12/1952
V2 60851   06/01/1955
V2 60824   01/11/1956
V2 60821   13/05/1960